MO HB2057 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-30 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-30 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding illegal aliens and immigration status verification for public assistance benefit purposes
Title
Changes the laws regarding illegal aliens and immigration status verification for public assistance benefit purposes
Sponsors
Rep. Wanda Brown [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-30 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-30 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-04-23 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-04-04 | Referred: Workforce Development and Workplace Safety (H) | |
2012-03-30 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-03-29 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB2057&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB2057I.htm |