MO HB2044 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1, SA 2 adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to retirement benefits for public employees

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to retirement benefits for public employees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-22 - House - House: HB 2044 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 124 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar - SA 1, SA 2 adopted
2018-04-18SenateTaken Up
2018-04-11SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2018-04-11SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
2018-04-11SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, April 11, 2018, 12:30pm, Bingham Conference Room
2018-04-09SenateReferred: Senate Fiscal Oversight(S)
2018-04-05SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2018-04-04SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass
2018-03-28SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2018-03-27SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, March 28, 2018, 9:00am, SCR 2
2018-03-08SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Health and Pensions(S)
2018-02-22HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2018-02-22HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 124 NOES: 16 PRESENT: 3
2018-02-22HouseTaken Up
2018-02-22HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1
2018-02-22HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-02-22HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-02-21HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2018-02-20HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, adopted
2018-02-20HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To - relating to retirement benefits for public employees
2018-02-20HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2018-02-13HousePlaced on Informal Calendar
2018-02-05HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-05HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-02-05HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-01-31HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2018-01-31HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2018-01-31HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-01-31HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-01-29HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-01-24HouseReferred: Pensions(H)
2018-01-10HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback