MO HB2039 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-14 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Creates the "Missouri Route 66 Centennial Commission"

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the "Missouri Route 66 Centennial Commission"

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-05 - House - House: HB 2039 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 139 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-14SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2018-05-10SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2018-05-01SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
2018-04-24SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2018-04-19SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 24, 2018, 1:00pm, Senate Lounge
2018-04-12SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Economic Development(S)
2018-04-05HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2018-04-05HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 139 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2018-04-05HouseTaken Up
2018-03-28HousePerfected (H)
2018-03-28HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2018-03-28HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2018-03-01HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-28HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-02-28HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-02-01HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2018-02-01HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-01-31HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-01-31HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-01-24HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-01-11HouseReferred: Special Committee on Tourism(H)
2018-01-10HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback