MO HB202 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-06 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-06 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to environmental control.
Title
Modifies provisions relating to environmental control.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-12 - House - House: HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS - SS HB 202 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 107 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-12 - House - House: HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS - SS HB 202 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 106 N: 47 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-12 - House - House: HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS - SS HB 202 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 105 N: 47 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House: HB 202 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-05-12 - House - House: HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS - SS HB 202 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 106 N: 47 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-12 - House - House: HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS - SS HB 202 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 105 N: 47 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House: HB 202 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-06 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2023-07-06 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2023-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2023-05-30 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2023-05-30 | House | Constitutional Objection Filed (S) |
2023-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker (H) |
2023-05-22 | House | House Message (H) |
2023-05-12 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 105 NOES: 47 PRESENT: 5 |
2023-05-12 | House | House Adopts (H) - SS AYES: 106 NOES: 47 PRESENT: 3 |
2023-05-12 | House | Taken Up |
2023-05-11 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-05-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-05-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-05-11 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 32 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Taken Up |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Thursday, May 11, 2023, 9:30 a.m., Senate Lounge |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2023-05-10 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2023-05-10 | Senate | SS Offered |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 4, 2023, 8:30 a.m., Senate Committee Room 1 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Second read and referred: Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources(S) |
2023-03-08 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2023-03-08 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 154 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-03-08 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2023-03-06 | House | Perfected (H) |
2023-03-06 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2023-03-06 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2023-02-27 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-02-27 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-02-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-02-22 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2023-02-22 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 19 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-02-09 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-02-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-02-02 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2023-01-19 | House | Referred: Agriculture Policy(H) |
2023-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2023-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2022-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |