MO HB2 | 2011 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-09-20 - Executive Session Scheduled - THURSDAY, SEPTEMBER 22, 2011, 9:00AM, SCR 1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-09-20 - Executive Session Scheduled - THURSDAY, SEPTEMBER 22, 2011, 9:00AM, SCR 1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the collection of moneys owed to the state
Title
Changes the laws regarding the collection of moneys owed to the state
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-20 | Executive Session Scheduled - THURSDAY, SEPTEMBER 22, 2011, 9:00AM, SCR 1 | |
2011-09-20 | Hearing Cancelled (S) | |
2011-09-14 | Executive Session Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, SEPTEMBER 21, 2011, 1:30PM, SCR 1 | |
2011-09-14 | Referred: Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight (S) | |
2011-09-14 | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2011-09-14 | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS | |
2011-09-13 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2011-09-12 | Second Read and Referred: Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight (S) | |
2011-09-09 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2011-09-09 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 150 NOES: 0 | |
2011-09-09 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-09-09 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-09-09 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-09-09 | Referred: Fiscal Review (H) | |
2011-09-09 | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3 ADOPTED | |
2011-09-08 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-09-08 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-09-08 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-09-08 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2011-09-08 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-09-08 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-09-08 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-09-08 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-09-07 | Referred: Ways and Means (H) | |
2011-09-07 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-09-06 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |