MO HB1992 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-01 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-01 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions for utility projects.
Title
Modifies provisions for utility projects.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Kidd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-01 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2020-03-18 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar |
2020-03-10 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2020-03-05 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-03-05 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-03-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2020-02-13 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-13 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-11 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2020-02-11 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2020-01-28 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred: Utilities(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled (H) |