MO HB1955 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Government Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes provisions governing statewide athletic association employees and members

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes provisions governing statewide athletic association employees and members

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-11HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2022-02-14HousePublic Hearing Continued (H)
2022-01-13HouseReferred: Special Committee on Government Accountability(H)
2022-01-06HouseRead Second Time (H)
2022-01-05HouseRead First Time (H)
2021-12-15HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback