MO HB1938 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-24 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-24 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates civil rights for homeless persons.
Title
Creates civil rights for homeless persons.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-03-06 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2018-01-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1938&year=2018&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/5697H.01I.pdf |