MO HB1936 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - Second read and referred: Senate Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - Second read and referred: Senate Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the primary election day from August to June
Title
Changes the primary election day from August to June
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-29 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections(S) |
2014-04-28 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-04-24 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 84 NOES: 67 |
2014-04-24 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-04-24 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-24 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-24 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-04-23 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2014-04-23 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - ha 1 adopted |
2014-04-23 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2014-04-23 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2014-03-24 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-24 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-24 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-03-05 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-03-05 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-04 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-03-04 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-02-25 | House | Referred: Elections(H) |
2014-02-24 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-02-20 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |