MO HB1896 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-13 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Adds provisions relating medical marijuana and other controlled substances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds provisions relating medical marijuana and other controlled substances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-14 - House - House: HB 1896 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 113 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - House - House: HB 1896 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 124 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - House - House: HB 1896 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 111 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - House - House: HB 1896 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 103 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House: HB 1896 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 145 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House: HB 1896 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 137 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: HB 1896 (*HA 2) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 86 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: HB 1896 (HA 1 HA 3) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 103 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: HB 1896 (*HA 3, A.A.) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 46 N: 97 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - House - House: HB 1896 (HA 2 HA 2) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 101 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-13HouseDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2020-07-13HouseApproved by Governor (G)
2020-05-27HouseDelivered to Governor
2020-05-27HouseSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2020-05-27HouseSigned by House Speaker(H)
2020-05-14HouseHouse Message (H)
2020-05-14HouseEmergency Clause Adopted on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 124 NOES: 21 PRESENT: 2
2020-05-14HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 113 NOES: 37 PRESENT: 0
2020-05-14HouseHouse Adopts (H) - SS as amended AYES: 111 NOES: 39 PRESENT: 0
2020-05-14HouseTaken Up
2020-05-08HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2020-05-08HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-05-08HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-05-07HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2020-05-07SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SS as amended
2020-05-06SenateEmergency Clause Adopted (S) - AYES: 29 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2020-05-06SenateThird Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1, SA 1 to SA 2, SA 2 as amended AYES: 29 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2020-05-06SenateSS Adopted (S)
2020-05-06SenateSenate Substitute Offered (S)
2020-05-06SenateTaken Up for Third Reading (S)
2020-05-06SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2020-05-06SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2020-05-04SenateReferred: Fiscal Oversight(S)
2020-04-30SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2020-04-29SenateSCS Voted Do Pass (S)
2020-04-29SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2020-04-29SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2020-04-25SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - 10:30 a.m. or upon recess, Wednesday, April 29, 2020, Senate Chamber
2020-04-07SenateSecond read and referred: Health and Pensions(S)
2020-03-12HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2020-03-12HouseEmergency Clause Adopted (H) - AYES: 137 NOES: 11 PRESENT: 0
2020-03-12HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 145 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
2020-03-12HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2020-03-10HousePerfected (H)
2020-03-10HouseHCS#2 Adopted (H)
2020-03-10HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2020-03-10HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2020-03-10HousePlaced on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
2020-03-05HouseHCS#2 Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2020-03-05HouseHCS#2 Voted Do Pass (H)
2020-03-05HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-03-03HouseRe-committed to Committee: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2020-03-03HouseTaken Up
2020-03-02HouseLaid Over (H) - HPA 1 adopted
2020-03-02HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2020-02-26HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2 Adopted
2020-02-26HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2020-02-26HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2020-02-26HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2020-02-18HousePlaced on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
2020-02-11HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2020-02-11HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-02-11HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-02-04HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2020-02-04HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2020-02-03HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2020-02-03HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-01-29HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2020-01-16HouseReferred: General Laws(H)
2020-01-09HouseRead Second Time (H)
2020-01-08HouseRead First Time (H)
2019-12-23HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1896&year=2020&code=R
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/4303H.01I.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/4303H.03C.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/4303H.03P.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/4303H.04C.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/4303H.04P.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/4303S.06C.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/4303S.07F.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/4303S.07T.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/028.009.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/028.012.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/028.011.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/028.010.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/038.005.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/038.004.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/Journals/RDay500506886-943.pdf#916
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/063.002.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/063.003.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/063.005.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/063.004.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback