MO HB1872 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-30 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-30 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates a portion of U.S. Highway 50 in Pettis County as the "LeRoy Van Dyke Highway."
Title
Designates a portion of U.S. Highway 50 in Pettis County as the "LeRoy Van Dyke Highway."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-30 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2016-03-01 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-25 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-17 | House | Referred: Select Committee on State and Local Governments(H) |
2016-02-17 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-16 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-16 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-16 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-13 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-16 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1872&year=2016&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/intro/HB1872I.PDF |