MO HB186 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H)
Pending: House Elections and Elected Officials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H)
Pending: House Elections and Elected Officials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows certain persons or agencies to request an audit if there is an investigation of an offense of theft or fraud by a public servant or an offense of official misconduct
Title
Allows certain persons or agencies to request an audit if there is an investigation of an offense of theft or fraud by a public servant or an offense of official misconduct
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-14 | House | Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |