MO HB1858 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the Department of Revenue to feature a map of all special taxing districts on its website

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the Department of Revenue to feature a map of all special taxing districts on its website

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-07 - House - House: HB 1858 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 119 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 41) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House: HB 1858 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 120 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 40) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House: HB 1858 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-01SenateDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2018-06-01SenateApproved by Governor (G)
2018-05-30SenateDelivered to Governor
2018-05-30SenateSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2018-05-30SenateSigned by House Speaker(H)
2018-05-09SenateSenate Message (S)
2018-05-09SenateTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 28 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-09SenateSenate Adopts Conference Committee Report (S) - AYES: 28 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-09SenateSenate Submits Conference Committee Report (S)
2018-05-08HouseReported to the Senate (S)
2018-05-07HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 120 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-07HouseHouse Adopts Conference Committee Report (H) - AYES: 119 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-07HouseTaken Up
2018-05-03HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-03HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-05-03HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-05-03HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2018-05-03HouseHouse Distributes Conference Committee Report (H)
2018-05-01HouseHouse Message (H)
2018-05-01HouseHouse Conference Committee Appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES CHRISTOFANELLI, CURTMAN, SMITH(163), CARPENTER, MORGAN
2018-05-01HouseSenate Message (S)
2018-04-30HouseSenate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - EIGEL, WALLINGFORD, KOENIG, NASHEED, RIZZO
2018-04-30HouseSenate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S)
2018-04-26HouseHouse Message (H)
2018-04-26HouseHouse Refuses to Adopt, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference
2018-04-26HouseTaken Up
2018-04-26HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-04-26HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-04-24HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2018-04-24SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SS
2018-04-24SenateThird Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 32 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-04-24SenateSS Adopted (S)
2018-04-24SenateSenate Substitute Offered (S)
2018-04-24SenateTaken Up
2018-04-05SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2018-03-27SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
2018-03-13SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2018-03-08SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, March 13, 2018, 9:00am, SCR 1
2018-03-01SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Ways and Means(S)
2018-02-19HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2018-02-19HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 143 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-19HouseTaken Up
2018-02-14HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted
2018-02-14HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2018-02-14HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2018-02-05HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-05HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-02-05HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-01-30HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2018-01-30HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-01-29HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-01-29HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-01-22HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-01-11HouseReferred: Ways and Means(H)
2018-01-04HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-03HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback