MO HB1850 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-11 - Executive Session Scheduled - Bill Not Heard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-11 - Executive Session Scheduled - Bill Not Heard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the El Camino Real as a historic highway
Title
Designates the El Camino Real as a historic highway
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-11 | House | Executive Session Scheduled - Bill Not Heard |
2014-03-11 | House | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) |
2014-02-25 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2014-02-17 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-02-13 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1850&year=2014&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills141/biltxt/intro/HB1850I.htm |