MO HB1823 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-15 - Referred: Judiciary(H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-15 - Referred: Judiciary(H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the definition of court costs to include jail board bills for incarceration.
Title
Modifies the definition of court costs to include jail board bills for incarceration.
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Kelley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-19 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1823&year=2020&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/4215H.01I.pdf |