MO HB18 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
NO TITLE
Title
NO TITLE
Sponsors
Rep. Cody Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-07 - House - House: HB 18 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 147 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - House: HB 18 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House: HB 18 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 43 NV: 3 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - House: HB 18 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House: HB 18 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 43 NV: 3 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2021-06-30 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2021-05-25 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2021-05-25 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2021-05-25 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2021-05-07 | House | House Message (H) |
2021-05-07 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 147 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-05-07 | House | House Adopts (H) - SCS AYES: 147 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-05-07 | House | Taken Up |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 34 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-05-03 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2021-04-28 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2021-04-28 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 28, upon morning recess, SCR 2 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Second read and referred: Appropriations(S) |
2021-04-27 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2021-04-27 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 98 NOES: 43 PRESENT: 3 |
2021-04-27 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2021-04-27 | House | Perfected (H) |
2021-04-27 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2021-04-27 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2021-04-27 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2021-04-26 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 23 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-26 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-04-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred: Budget(H) |
2021-02-25 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |