MO HB179 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-25 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-25 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows a retired military member to provide a Veterans' Identification Card issued by the United States Department of Veterans Affairs in order to receive a veteran designation on his or her driver's license
Title
Allows a retired military member to provide a Veterans' Identification Card issued by the United States Department of Veterans Affairs in order to receive a veteran designation on his or her driver's license
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-03 - House - HB 179 HBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 156 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-25 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor (G) |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 34 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar (S) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass consent |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 13, 2015, 3:00pm, Senate Committee Room 2 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety(S) |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee (S) |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Education(S) |
2015-03-03 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-03-03 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 156 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-03 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-02-26 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2015-02-12 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2015-02-11 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2015-02-11 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Rules(H) |
2015-02-10 | House | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) |
2015-02-10 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2015-02-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-03 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2015-01-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-07 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2014-12-08 | House | Prefiled (H) |