MO HB1777 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-25 - Withdrawn (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-25 - Withdrawn (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Governor to issue an annual proclamation designating May 10 as "Colon Cancer Awareness Day"
Title
Requires the Governor to issue an annual proclamation designating May 10 as "Colon Cancer Awareness Day"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-25 | Withdrawn (H) | |
2010-02-03 | Referred: Tourism (H) | |
2010-01-25 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-21 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1777&year=2010&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills101/biltxt/intro/HB1777I.htm |