MO HB1771 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-18 - Action Postponed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-18 - Action Postponed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the department of revenue to issue income tax refunds to the estates or families of certain terrorist attack first responders.
Title
Requires the department of revenue to issue income tax refunds to the estates or families of certain terrorist attack first responders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2020-03-18 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2020-03-11 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-03-05 | House | Referred: Ways and Means(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-12 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1771&year=2020&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/3564H.01I.pdf |