MO HB174 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-04 - SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-04 - SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides protections for alternatives to abortion agencies
Title
Provides protections for alternatives to abortion agencies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - House - House: HB 174 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 105 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House: HB 174 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 110 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House: HB 174 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 118 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House: HB 174 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 112 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House: HB 174 (*HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 38 N: 108 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2017-03-28 - House - House: HB 174 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 109 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House: HB 174 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 116 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House: HB 174 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 110 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House: HB 174 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 118 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House: HB 174 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 112 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House: HB 174 (*HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 38 N: 108 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2017-03-28 - House - House: HB 174 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 109 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House: HB 174 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 116 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, May 3, 2017, 8:00am, Senate Lounge |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Seniors, Families, and Children(S) |
2017-03-30 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2017-03-30 | House | Emergency Clause Adopted (H) - AYES: 112 NOES: 38 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-30 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 118 NOES: 36 PRESENT: 1 |
2017-03-30 | House | Taken Up |
2017-03-28 | House | Perfected (H) - AYES: 116 NOES: 34 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-28 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2017-03-28 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2017-03-28 | House | Taken Up |
2017-03-13 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-13 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-03-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-22 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2017-02-22 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-02-21 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-02-21 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-14 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred: Children and Families(H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2016-12-08 | House | Prefiled (H) |