MO HB1729 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-13 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Repeals provisions relating to prevailing wages on public works

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeals provisions relating to prevailing wages on public works

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-18 - House - House: HB 1729 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 97 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House: HB 1729 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 97 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House: HB 1729 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 107 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House: HB 1729 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 89 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: HB 1729 (*HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 55 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2018-03-06 - House - House: HB 1729 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 99 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: HB 1729 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 86 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-13HouseDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2018-07-13HouseApproved by Governor (G)
2018-05-30HouseDelivered to Governor
2018-05-30HouseSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2018-05-30HouseSigned by House Speaker(H)
2018-05-18HouseHouse Message (H)
2018-05-18HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 97 NOES: 50 PRESENT: 1
2018-05-18HouseHouse Adopts (H) - SS AYES: 97 NOES: 46 PRESENT: 1
2018-05-18HouseTaken Up
2018-05-18HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-18HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-05-18HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-05-17HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2018-05-17SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SS
2018-05-17SenateThird Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 22 NOES: 9 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-17SenateSS Adopted (S)
2018-05-17SenateSenate Substitute Offered (S)
2018-05-17SenateTaken Up
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2018-04-04SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2018-04-03SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
2018-03-28SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2018-03-26SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, March 28, 2018, 1:00pm, SCR 1
2018-03-15SenateSecond read and referred: Senate General Laws(S)
2018-03-13HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2018-03-13HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 89 NOES: 62 PRESENT: 0
2018-03-13HouseTaken Up
2018-03-08HousePlaced on Informal Calendar
2018-03-06HousePerfected (H) - AYES: 86 NOES: 63 PRESENT: 0
2018-03-06HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2018-03-06HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2018-03-06HouseLaid Over (H)
2018-03-06HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2018-03-06HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2018-02-20HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-19HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-02-19HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-02-13HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2018-02-13HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-13HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2018-02-13HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-02-06HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-01-04HouseReferred: Economic Development(H)
2018-01-04HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-03HouseRead First Time (H)
2017-12-21HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1729&year=2018&code=R
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4813H.01I.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4813H.02C.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4813H.02P.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4813S.11F.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4813S.11T.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/rollcalls/035.007.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/rollcalls/035.006.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/rollcalls/035.005.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/rollcalls/039.021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/rollcalls/039.020.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/rollcalls/077.011.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/rollcalls/077.010.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback