MO HB1699 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-18 - Referred: Ways and Means(H)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-18 - Referred: Ways and Means(H)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Implements the Streamlined Sales and Use Tax Agreement and directs the savings created to certain funds
Title
Implements the Streamlined Sales and Use Tax Agreement and directs the savings created to certain funds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | House | Referred: Ways and Means(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-20 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1699&year=2018&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/5146H.01I.pdf |