MO HB1684 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-07 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-07 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the tax credit for a Missouri wood energy producer by extending it until June 30, 2020, and limiting the amount of all credits to $3 million in any fiscal year
Title
Changes the laws regarding the tax credit for a Missouri wood energy producer by extending it until June 30, 2020, and limiting the amount of all credits to $3 million in any fiscal year
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-07 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, May 7, 2014, Nooon or upon noon recess, Senate Lounge |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government(S) |
2014-04-28 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-04-24 | House | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (H) - HPA 1 ADOPTED AYES: 107 NOES: 36 PRESENT: 3 |
2014-04-24 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-04-24 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-24 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-24 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-04-23 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2014-04-23 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - ha 1, hsa 1 for ha 2 adopted |
2014-04-23 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2014-03-13 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-13 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-13 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-27 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-02-27 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-18 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-18 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-02-11 | House | Referred: Agriculture Policy(H) |
2014-02-03 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-30 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |