MO HB166 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-15 - Referred: Civil and Criminal Proceedings(H)
Pending: House Civil and Criminal Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-15 - Referred: Civil and Criminal Proceedings(H)
Pending: House Civil and Criminal Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows marijuana convictions to be expunged for certain persons contingent upon the passage of a constitutional amendment or other statutory enactment legalizing marijuana
Title
Allows marijuana convictions to be expunged for certain persons contingent upon the passage of a constitutional amendment or other statutory enactment legalizing marijuana
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | House | Referred: Civil and Criminal Proceedings(H) |
2015-01-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-07 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2014-12-05 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB166&year=2015&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills151/billpdf/intro/HB0166I.PDF |