MO HB1647 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-06 - Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-06 - Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the state and political subdivisions from implementing policies affecting property rights and from entering into certain relationships with organizations
Title
Prohibits the state and political subdivisions from implementing policies affecting property rights and from entering into certain relationships with organizations
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Moon [R] | Rep. Paul Curtman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-06 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, May 6, 2014, 1:30pm, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate General Laws(S) |
2014-04-28 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-04-28 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 99 NOES: 46 |
2014-04-28 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-04-23 | House | Perfected (H) |
2014-04-23 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2014-04-14 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-14 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-14 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-03-31 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-03-31 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-27 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-20 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred: Downsizing State Government(H) |
2014-01-30 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-29 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |