MO HB1645 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-15 - Referred: Special Committee on Criminal Justice(H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-15 - Referred: Special Committee on Criminal Justice(H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the cost to the state for incarcerating an offender be considered during sentencing and parole hearings.
Title
Requires the cost to the state for incarcerating an offender be considered during sentencing and parole hearings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Criminal Justice(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-06 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1645&year=2020&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/4171H.01I.pdf |