MO HB1630 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-18 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-18 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the composition of the Missouri Highways and Transportation Commission
Title
Changes the laws regarding the composition of the Missouri Highways and Transportation Commission
Sponsors
Rep. Ward Franz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-04-12 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 18, 8:00AM, SCR 1 | |
2012-04-05 | Second Read and Referred: Transportation (S) | |
2012-03-28 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-03-28 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 147 NOES: 2 | |
2012-03-27 | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-07 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-03-07 | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2012-03-06 | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2012-03-06 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-21 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-08 | Referred: Transportation Funding and Public Institutions (H) | |
2012-02-06 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-02-02 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |