MO HB162 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-11 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-11 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding entities registered with the Secretary of State
Title
Changes the laws regarding entities registered with the Secretary of State
Sponsors
Rep. Rudy Veit [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - House - House: HB 162 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 150 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, May 11, 9:00 a.m., SCR 2 |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2021-05-06 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2021-05-04 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 27, 8:15 a.m., Senate Lounge |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Second read and referred: Small Business and Industry(S) |
2021-04-19 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2021-04-19 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 150 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-19 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2021-04-15 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-15 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-04-15 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2021-04-12 | House | Perfected (H) |
2021-04-12 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2021-04-12 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2021-04-12 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2021-04-12 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-25 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2021-03-04 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-03 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-03 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-24 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2021-02-24 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2021-02-17 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |