MO HB1608 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-13 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-13 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals provisions and sections of law regarding unfunded and obsolete programs and establishes expiration dates for specified provisions
Title
Repeals provisions and sections of law regarding unfunded and obsolete programs and establishes expiration dates for specified provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Cole McNary [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-13 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2012-07-13 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2012-05-30 | Delivered to Governor | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2012-05-16 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 33 NAYS: 00 | |
2012-05-10 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2012-05-10 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2012-05-01 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-04-30 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - TUESDAY, MAY 1, 1:30PM, SCR 1 | |
2012-04-12 | Second Read and Referred: General Laws (S) | |
2012-04-05 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-04-05 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 103 NOES: 044 | |
2012-04-04 | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 ADOPTED | |
2012-04-04 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2012-03-22 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-22 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-22 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Rules - No Action Taken (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-07 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-03-07 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-07 | Executive Session Completed (H) - VOTE TO DO PASS CONSENT FAILED | |
2012-03-01 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-01 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-23 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-08 | Referred: Downsizing State Government (H) | |
2012-02-02 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-02-01 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |