MO HB1604 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-07 - Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-07 - Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies residency requirements for personnel of certain municipal police forces.
Title
Modifies residency requirements for personnel of certain municipal police forces.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House: HB 1604 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 106 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: HB 1604 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 105 N: 41 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: HB 1604 (HA 2 HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 91 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: HB 1604 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 105 N: 41 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: HB 1604 (HA 2 HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 91 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 32) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-07 | Senate | Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S) |
2020-03-09 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2020-03-09 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 105 NOES: 41 PRESENT: 3 |
2020-03-09 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2020-03-04 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 |
2020-03-04 | House | HCS#2 Adopted (H) |
2020-03-04 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2020-03-04 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2020-02-13 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-13 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2020-02-11 | House | HCS#2 Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-04 | House | HCS#2 Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-27 | House | Returned to Committee of Origin (H) - Judiciary AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-01-27 | House | Voted to Return to the Committee of Origin (H) |
2020-01-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2020-01-23 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-01-21 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-01-21 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-14 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-05 | House | Prefiled (H) |