MO HB1586 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates provisions relating to the practice of veterinary medicine
Title
Creates provisions relating to the practice of veterinary medicine
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Murphy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2022-04-07 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-04-07 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-04-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-03-24 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred: Rural Community Development(H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2021-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |