MO HB1551 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-21 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-21 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the crime of operating a motorized vessel with excessive blood alcohol content when a person operates a motorized vessel on any navigable waterway with a blood alcohol content of .08 of 1% or more
Title
Creates the crime of operating a motorized vessel with excessive blood alcohol content when a person operates a motorized vessel on any navigable waterway with a blood alcohol content of .08 of 1% or more
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-21 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-21 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-22 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-14 | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety (H) | |
2012-01-30 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-26 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1551&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB1551I.htm |