MO HB1545 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the establishment of alternative county highway commissions in certain counties
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the establishment of alternative county highway commissions in certain counties
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Hudson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2022-03-24 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-03-23 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-03-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-03-09 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-02-16 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2021-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |