MO HB1537 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-13 - Referred: General Laws(H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-13 - Referred: General Laws(H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes provisions relating to the possession or use of medical marijuana by persons who have medical marijuana cards and that are on probation or parole
Title
Establishes provisions relating to the possession or use of medical marijuana by persons who have medical marijuana cards and that are on probation or parole
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2021-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |