MO HB1535 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-13 - Referred: Utilities(H)
Pending: House Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-13 - Referred: Utilities(H)
Pending: House Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that restrictive covenants shall not limit or prohibit the installation of rooftop solar panels or solar collectors
Title
Specifies that restrictive covenants shall not limit or prohibit the installation of rooftop solar panels or solar collectors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | House | Referred: Utilities(H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2021-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |