MO HB148 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-17 - Referred: Workforce Development(H)
Pending: House Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-17 - Referred: Workforce Development(H)
Pending: House Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the "Economic Development Grant Program" whose funds are used to reopen closed manufacturing facilities.
Title
Establishes the "Economic Development Grant Program" whose funds are used to reopen closed manufacturing facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | House | Referred: Workforce Development(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB148&year=2019&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/0460H.01I.pdf |