MO HB1455 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-10 - Second Read and Referred: Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate Jobs, Economic Development And Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-10 - Second Read and Referred: Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate Jobs, Economic Development And Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the Manufacturing Jobs Act, the Missouri Job Development Fund, and economic development
Title
Changes the laws regarding the Manufacturing Jobs Act, the Missouri Job Development Fund, and economic development
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-10 | Second Read and Referred: Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government (S) | |
2012-05-03 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-05-03 | Third Read and Passed (H) | |
2012-04-25 | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1,HA 2, HA 3, HA 4, HA 5, HA 6 ADOPTED | |
2012-03-29 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-22 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-22 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-29 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-02-29 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-28 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-28 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-21 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-09 | Referred: Economic Development (H) | |
2012-01-24 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-23 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |