MO HB1430 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-01 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-01 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that anyone providing medical services cannot be required to perform or participate in activities that violate his or her conscience or principles
Title
Specifies that anyone providing medical services cannot be required to perform or participate in activities that violate his or her conscience or principles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Public Hearing Continued (S) - Thursday, April 17, 2014, 8:30am, Senate Lounge |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Public Hearing Continued (S) |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 10, 2014, 8:30am, Senate Lounge |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Veterans' Affairs and Health(S) |
2014-02-13 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-02-13 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) |
2014-02-13 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-02-12 | House | Perfected (H) |
2014-02-12 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) - AYES: 116 NOES: 38 |
2014-02-10 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-10 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-10 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-02-05 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-05 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-01-29 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-22 | House | Referred: Health Care Policy(H) |
2014-01-16 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-15 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |