MO HB1420 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-15 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-15 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding school employee retirement to reinstate a certain retirement allowance rate
Title
Changes the laws regarding school employee retirement to reinstate a certain retirement allowance rate
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-15 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-11 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-09 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation(H) |
2016-02-09 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-09 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-09 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-28 | House | Referred: Pensions(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1420&year=2016&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/intro/HB1420I.PDF |