MO HB1381 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-01 - Action Postponed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-01 - Action Postponed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Joint Committee on Children's Services Oversight to review laws and policies, study problems, develop a comprehensive policy, and review contracted services
Title
Establishes the Joint Committee on Children's Services Oversight to review laws and policies, study problems, develop a comprehensive policy, and review contracted services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-01 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2014-05-01 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2014-04-24 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-28 | House | Referred: Downsizing State Government(H) |
2014-01-15 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-14 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1381&year=2014&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills141/biltxt/intro/HB1381I.htm |