MO HB135 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred: Special Committee on Tourism(H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred: Special Committee on Tourism(H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the corn dog as the official food of the Missouri State Fair
Title
Designates the corn dog as the official food of the Missouri State Fair
Sponsors
Rep. Ian Mackey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-14 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Tourism(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |