MO HB1303 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-22 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-22 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals a provision prohibiting voters from allowing their ballots to be seen
Title
Repeals a provision prohibiting voters from allowing their ballots to be seen
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Adams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2021-04-22 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-21 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-04-21 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-04-14 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-03-25 | House | Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H) |
2021-02-25 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |