MO HB1266 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-16 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Financial And Governmental Organizations And Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-16 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Financial And Governmental Organizations And Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the regal fritillary as the official state butterfly
Title
Designates the regal fritillary as the official state butterfly
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-16 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-04-12 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - MONDAY, APRIL 16, 2:30PM, SENATE LOUNGE | |
2012-04-05 | Second Read and Referred: Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections (S) | |
2012-03-29 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-03-28 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 127 NOES: 15 | |
2012-03-28 | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) | |
2012-03-28 | Laid Over - Third Reading (H) | |
2012-03-28 | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) | |
2012-03-19 | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) | |
2012-03-01 | Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent (H) | |
2012-03-01 | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2012-03-01 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-23 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-02-23 | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2012-02-23 | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2012-02-23 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-09 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-01-19 | Referred: Tourism and Natural Resources | |
2012-01-12 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-11 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |