MO HB1237 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the conveyance of certain state property.
Title
Authorizes the conveyance of certain state property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - House - House: HB 1237 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 106 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, May 15, 2019, 12:00pm or upon morning recess, Bingham Conference Room |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2019-05-09 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2019-05-09 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, May 7, 2019, 12 p.m. or upon morning recess, whichever is later, Senate Lounge |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Second read and referred: General Laws(S) |
2019-04-23 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2019-04-23 | House | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (H) - HPA 1 adopted AYES: 106 NOES: 43 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-23 | House | Taken Up |
2019-04-23 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 4 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-23 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-04-18 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2019-04-17 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3 adopted |
2019-04-17 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-04-17 | House | Taken Up |
2019-04-09 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-08 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-08 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2019-04-01 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-03-28 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-03-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-03-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred: Corrections and Public Institutions(H) |
2019-03-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-03-01 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |