MO HB118 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a statutory cause of action replacing the common law action for damages against a health care provider for personal injury arising out of the rendering of or failure to render health services
Title
Establishes a statutory cause of action replacing the common law action for damages against a health care provider for personal injury arising out of the rendering of or failure to render health services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-05 - House - HB 118 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 101 N: 50 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - HB 118 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 101 N: 53 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - HB 118 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 110 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - HB 118 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 101 N: 53 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - HB 118 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 110 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 21, 2015, 12:00pm, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Small Business, Insurance, and Industry(S) |
2015-03-09 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-03-05 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 101 NOES: 50 PRESENT: 2 |
2015-03-05 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-03-04 | House | Perfected (H) - AYES: 101 NOES: 53 PRESENT: 1 |
2015-03-04 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2015-02-23 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-02-23 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-19 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Social Services(H) |
2015-02-19 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-02-18 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-10 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-01-27 | House | Re-referred to Committee: Health and Mental Health Policy(H) |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred: Civil and Criminal Proceedings(H) |
2015-01-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-07 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2014-12-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |