MO HB1173 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Executive Session Scheduled - Bill Not Heard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Executive Session Scheduled - Bill Not Heard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to criminal proceedings
Title
Modifies provisions relating to criminal proceedings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | House | Executive Session Scheduled - Bill Not Heard |
2015-04-08 | House | Executive Session Scheduled - Bill Not Heard |
2015-04-02 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Judiciary(H) |
2015-04-02 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 AYES: 9 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-01 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2015-04-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-30 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-03-11 | House | Referred: Civil and Criminal Proceedings(H) |
2015-03-11 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-03-10 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1173&year=2015&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills151/billpdf/intro/HB1173I.PDF |