MO HB1163 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-28 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-28 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Freedom to Choose Trash Collection Services Act which requires voter approval of any contract with mandated haulers of trash collection except in North Kansas City, Kansas City, and St. Louis
Title
Establishes the Freedom to Choose Trash Collection Services Act which requires voter approval of any contract with mandated haulers of trash collection except in North Kansas City, Kansas City, and St. Louis
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-28 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-03-26 | Referred: Small Business (H) | |
2012-01-09 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-05 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1163&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB1163I.htm |