MO HB1144 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the Missouri Housing Development Commission from requiring a prevailing hourly wage to be paid to a contractor on a project for a housing tax credit if it is in a Governor-declared disaster area
Title
Prohibits the Missouri Housing Development Commission from requiring a prevailing hourly wage to be paid to a contractor on a project for a housing tax credit if it is in a Governor-declared disaster area
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 23, 2014, upon evening adjournment, Senate Committee Room 2 |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Small Business, Insurance, and Industry(S) |
2014-04-14 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-04-10 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 88 NOES: 63 |
2014-04-10 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-04-08 | House | Perfected (H) - AYES: 85 NOES: 64 |
2014-04-08 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2014-03-24 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-24 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-24 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-25 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-02-25 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-24 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-24 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-18 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Referred: Workforce Development and Workplace Safety(H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2013-12-06 | House | Prefiled (H) |