MO HB1141 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-27 - Second read and referred: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-27 - Second read and referred: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Designates U.S. Highway 54 in Missouri as the "Discover More on Route 54 Highway"
Title
Designates U.S. Highway 54 in Missouri as the "Discover More on Route 54 Highway"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure(S) |
2014-02-26 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-02-26 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 142 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 3 |
2014-02-26 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-02-24 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2014-02-13 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-02-13 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-02-13 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-10 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-02-10 | House | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) |
2014-02-04 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-02-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-01-28 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2013-12-06 | House | Prefiled (H) |