MO HB1140 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-02 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-02 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that any water supply district in St. Charles County must be placed under the jurisdiction of the Missouri Public Service Commission for rates, charges, or other fees
Title
Specifies that any water supply district in St. Charles County must be placed under the jurisdiction of the Missouri Public Service Commission for rates, charges, or other fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | House | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Referred: Utilities(H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2013-12-06 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1140&year=2014&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills141/biltxt/intro/HB1140I.htm |